Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:43:40 (UTC).

LARISA VAYNBERG VS CHRISTOPHER VANEK

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 LARISA VAYNBERG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER VANEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3736

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAYNBERG LARISA

Defendant

VANEK CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RULSKY JERRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Larisa Vaynberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Larisa Vaynberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Larisa Vaynberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Larisa Vaynberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larisa Vaynberg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY