This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 04:33:15 (UTC).

LARISA GALSTYAN VS LUSINE KHACHIKYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 LARISA GALSTYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LUSINE KHACHIKYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3110

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GALSTYAN LARISA

GALSTYAN LARISSA

Respondents and Defendants

KHACHIKYAN LUSINE

LIL MONSTER CLOTHING

KHACHIKYAN MARINE

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

THE BARNES FIRM L.CC

PETROUSIAN ARTHUR

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GALADZHYAN HYKA

GALADZHYAN AYKANUSH HEIDI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...) OF 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...) OF 10/21/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LARISA GALSTYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

9/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LARISA GALSTYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARTHUR M. PETROUSIAN IN SUPPORT OF COST REIMBURSEMENT

9/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARTHUR M. PETROUSIAN IN SUPPORT OF COST REIMBURSEMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO RESUBMIT DEF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 08/19/2021

8/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 08/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/22/2020

9/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/5/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LARISA GALSTYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT

11/5/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LARISA GALSTYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/5/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/12/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Resubmit Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Resubmit Def...) of 10/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Resubmit Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Resubmit Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Resubmit Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ARTHUR M. PETROUSIAN IN SUPPORT OF COST REIMBURSEMENT); Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF LARISA GALSTYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT); Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReStatus of Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larissa Galstyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3110    Hearing Date: September 22, 2020    Dept: 28

Request for Default Judgment

Having considered all documents submitted in support of two applications for default judgment, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On November 13, 2017, Plaintiff Larisa Galstyan (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Lusine Khachikyan, Marine Khachikyan, and Lil Monster Clothing. Plaintiff alleges premises liability for a shelf falling on Plaintiff on February 9, 2017.

On November 13, 2018, Plaintiff filed an amendment to the complaint renaming Doe 1 as Defendant Harriet Schwartz.

On June 19, 2019, the Court approved an amendment to the complaint renaming Plaintiff’s first name as Larissa.

On September 3, 2019, the Court dismissed Defendant Khachikyan with prejudice.

On September 20, 2019, Plaintiff filed a first amended complaint against Defendants Marine Khachikyan and Lil Monster Clothing.

On April 29, 2020, the Court entered default against Defendants Lil Monster Clothing and Marine Khachikyan.

On May 18, 2020, the Court dismissed all remaining doe defendants from the complaint without prejudice.

On May 12, 2020, Plaintiff filed applications for entry of default judgment against Defendants Lil Monster Clothing and Marine Khachikyan.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Default/Default Judgment as to Defendants Lil Monster Clothing and Marine Khachikyan is scheduled for November 6, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Plaintiff asks the Court to enter a default judgment against Defendants Lil Monster Clothing and Marine Khachikyan and award Plaintiff $1,020,941.87.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the applications filed on May 12, 2020 must be denied for two reasons.

First, Plaintiff’s applications for a default judgment must be denied because Plaintiff failed to submit evidence showing an entitlement to the requested special damages. Plaintiff must file evidence substantiating Plaintiff’s request for special damages. (See Carlson v. Koivumaki (2014) 227 Cal.App.4th 879, 898.) Plaintiff has submitted evidence showing she has sustained $5,087.00 in special damages. However, Plaintiff is requesting $18,300.00 in special damages. The applications must be denied because Plaintiff has not substantiated $13,213.00 of the special damages Plaintiff requests in her applications.

Second, there is insufficient evidence showing an award of $1,000,000.00 in general damages would compensate Plaintiff for the non-economic injuries Plaintiff has sustained. General damages are intended to compensate for pain and suffering, emotional distress, and other non-quantifiable damages that flow from quantifiable damages. (See Licudine v. Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (2016) 3 Cal.App.5th 881, 892.) There is no evidence showing what degree of pain, suffering, emotional distress, or any other sort of non-quantifiable damages Plaintiff has sustained. As such, the Court cannot conclude that $1,000,000.00 in general damages would compensate Plaintiff for the non-economic injuries Plaintiff has sustained.

CONCLUSION

The applications for default judgment filed on May 12, 2020 against Defendants Lil Monster Clothing and Marine Khachikyan are DENIED.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.