This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 09:16:23 (UTC).

LARION KRAYZMAN VS RON HACKER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 LARION KRAYZMAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against RON HACKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1008

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRAYZMAN LARION

Defendants

NAVE LANTZ

HACKER RON AKA RONEN HACKER AKA RONALD HACKER

BAF FUND LLC

UNDERHAL EUGENE

BAG FUND LLC

Not Classified By Court

THE BENEFIT OF PARTIES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6) OF 11/10/2020

11/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6) OF 11/10/2020

Notice of Related Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020

Proof of Service - No Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Lien

10/9/2020: Notice of Lien

Proof of Personal Service - (AMENDED)

9/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service - (AMENDED)

Proof of Personal Service - (AMENDED)

9/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service - (AMENDED)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 11:33 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT PER CCP 170.6) of 11/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Lantz Nave (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 1:48 PM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Ron Hacker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint and Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint and Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint and Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint and Notice of Reassignment); Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Larion Krayzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAG FUND LLC is a litigant