This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 21:54:46 (UTC).

LARA POWELL VS HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 LARA POWELL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1256

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

POWELL LARA

Respondents and Defendants

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC

DOES 1 TO 20

SKULL BASE INSITUTE

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SHAHINIAN HRAYR M.D.

SKULL BASE FOUNDATION

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

SHAHINAIAN HRAYR M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

QUINN KEVIN F. ESQ.

QUINN KEVIN FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

MCANDREWS THOMAS FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-22 00:00:00

3/22/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-22 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-11 00:00:00

6/11/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-11 00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Case Management Statement -

7/12/2018: Case Management Statement -

Minute Order -

9/20/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

10/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order -

9/12/2018: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

5/9/2018: Minute Order -

Case Management Statement -

7/2/2018: Case Management Statement -

Case Management Statement -

7/12/2018: Case Management Statement -

Minute Order -

7/17/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Ruling -

7/20/2018: Notice of Ruling -

SUMMONS -

5/12/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE (2) CORPORATE NEGLIGENCE/ NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION; ETC

5/12/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE (2) CORPORATE NEGLIGENCE/ NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION; ETC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lara Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; (Order ReRelated Cases; Order-Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Hrayr Shahinian, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hrayr Shahinian, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lara Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lara Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE (2) CORPORATE NEGLIGENCE/ NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKULL BASE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE INSTITUTE is a litigant