This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 03:37:07 (UTC).

LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD VS GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0100

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPPHERD LAQUESHA

Defendants

BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC.

GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS LP

NIJAR SWARANJIT S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RABI JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

GORDON GREGORY H.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/15/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

7/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2022

4/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN RABI IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN RABI IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Related Case

4/4/2022: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 04/06/2022

4/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE) OF 04/06/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Service/Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC. (Defendant); SWARANJIT S. NIJAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC. (Defendant); SWARANJIT S. NIJAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC. (Defendant); SWARANJIT S. NIJAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC. (Defendant); SWARANJIT S. NIJAR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Case) of 04/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Justin Rabi in Support of Notice of Related Case); Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LAQUESHA SHEPPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Golden Oppurtunity Investments LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rabi, Justin