This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 06:13:06 (UTC).

LANORA EAST VS FCA US, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 LANORA EAST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0517

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST LANORA

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

FCA US LLC.

SCOTT ROBINSON CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/29/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); As to: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/26/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff); As to: SCOTT ROBINSON CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/27/2023; Service Cost: 88.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); SCOTT ROBINSON CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); SCOTT ROBINSON CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LANORA EAST (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); SCOTT ROBINSON CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less