This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 15:21:53 (UTC).

LAND BANKERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FIROOZ PAYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 LAND BANKERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FIROOZ PAYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7661

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAND BANKERS LLC

Defendants

PAYAN FIROOZ

ALL PERSON CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

MRC PORTO MARINA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINCLAIR KEVIN S.

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN COLBY J.

RIKOS GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/26/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/19/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [CONSISTING OF 18 PAGES]

4/19/2022: Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [CONSISTING OF 18 PAGES]

Notice of Ruling

4/21/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING BOND

4/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING BOND

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [RES. ID# 726763...) OF 04/19/2022

4/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [RES. ID# 726763...) OF 04/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [RES. ID# 726763...)

4/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [RES. ID# 726763...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

4/13/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF LAND BANKERS, LLCS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF LAND BANKERS, LLCS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION FIROOZ PAYANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF LAND BANKERS, LLCS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION FIROOZ PAYANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF LAND BANKERS, LLCS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF STEVEN C. HUSKEY; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ AFRAMIAN

4/15/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF STEVEN C. HUSKEY; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ AFRAMIAN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ AFRAMIAN ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEHROUZ AFRAMIAN ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/4/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER NELSON ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER NELSON ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW STEINBERG ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

4/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW STEINBERG ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Colby J. Ryan (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF POSTING BOND); Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ([Res. ID# 726763158797]) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOther - (Ruling Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction [consisting of 18 pages]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Res. ID# 726763...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Res. ID# 726763...) of 04/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketReply (in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Steven C. Huskey; Supplemental Declaration of Behrouz Aframian); Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MRC Porto Marina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer (DEFENDANT MRC PORTO MARINA, LLC?S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAND BANKERS, LLC?S COMPLAINT); Filed by MRC Porto Marina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF RECORDING OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)); Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Land Bankers, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAND BANKERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where All persons claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate lien, or interest in the real property commonly known as 4263 W. 59th Street, Los Angeles, CA 90043 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN COLBY JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Rikos