Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:56:03 (UTC).

LANA TROTTA ET AL VS GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 LANA TROTTA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7919

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TROTTA MARIO

TROTTA LANA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

GARDNER BRENT

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP

GGP INC.

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LLC

ASPEN MANAGEMENT GROUP DOE 3

MODERN PARKING INC. DOE 2

MODERN APEX ENTERPRISES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISHER J. JAMIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WAYNE ERIC J. ESQ.

AVILA MICHAEL F. ESQ.

D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/30/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order

2/26/2019: Stipulation and Order

Answer

1/12/2018: Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/8/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

9/29/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial); Filed by Lana Trotta (Plaintiff); Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Lana Trotta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Lana Trotta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Lana Trotta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Glendale I Mall Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Lana Trotta (Plaintiff); Mario Trotta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GGP INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant