This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 07:08:47 (UTC).

LAMONTE JOHNSON VS LIONEL HENDERSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 LAMONTE JOHNSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LIONEL HENDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0970

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON LAMONTE

Defendants

HENDERSON LIONEL

LION TECHNOLOGIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL AND INVESTORS FIRST CHOICE

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL DBA INVESTORS FIRST CHOICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS-MONIZ TAYLOR FINDLEY

Defendant Attorneys

BEALL KELLY ANDREW

BRAUNSTEIN CLARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

4/1/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

2/2/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/2/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

1/24/2022: Notice - COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

Answer

1/20/2022: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/26/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by Lionel Henderson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Kelly Andrew Beall (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rehabbers Financial, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCopy of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens); Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lion Technologies, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LaMonte Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS-MONIZ TAYLOR FINDLEY