This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 22:55:25 (UTC).

LAMMEY, JAMES EDWARD, JR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 LAMMEY, JAMES EDWARD, JR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5099

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TROUT VERONICA

Decedent

LAMMEY JAMES EDWARD JR

Not Classified By Court

SETTLE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

1/8/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

1/13/2021: Letters (Initial)

Bond - Liberty Mutual

11/25/2020: Bond - Liberty Mutual

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

11/18/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

11/23/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

8/7/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

7/6/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketBond (Liberty Mutual ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE