Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:47:23 (UTC).

LAMBERTO RODRIGUEZ VS JD REINFORCING , INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 LAMBERTO RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JD REINFORCING , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4822

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ LAMBERTO

Defendant

JD REINFORCING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

KRING KYLE DION

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

1/28/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/3/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

10/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/1/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Hearing03/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 16:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JD Reinforcing , Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JD Reinforcing , Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JD Reinforcing , Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lamberto Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JD REINFORCING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRING KYLE DION