Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 18:44:53 (UTC).

LAM, CECILIA HO SZE VS DOSHI, RAI D.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 LAM, CECILIA HO SZE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DOSHI, RAI D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YANG, BRYANT Y.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0410

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YANG, BRYANT Y.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAM CECILIA HO SZE

Respondent

DOSHI RAI D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDS THOMAS D.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

5/5/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

5/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/15/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/15/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

4/15/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 9:30 AM in Department K, Yang, Bryant Y., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDS THOMAS D