This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 12:38:40 (UTC).

LAKEYIA POUNDS VS P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LAKEYIA POUNDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P W STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0392

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POUNDS LAKEYIA

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SOUTHWEST LA INC DBA RYTECH OF SOUTHWEST LA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION TO SUBSTITUTE FOR DOE 51

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS BARTLETT

Defendant Attorneys

VAHDAT AVA

NAGASHIMA ASHLEY WALKER

CROWE JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/22/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/22/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

11/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/28/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/30/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lakeyia Pounds on 10/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Lakeyia Pounds as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Liberty Insurance Corporation to substitute for Doe 51 (Defendant); As to: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); As to: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 90.00; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation to substitute for Doe 51 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/26/2022; Service Cost: 140.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/26/2022; Service Cost: 140.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lakeyia Pounds (Plaintiff); As to: P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southwest LA, Inc dba Rytech of Southwest LA, a California corporation (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Shultz in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less