This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 10:17:04 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC VS ERIC BARKER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ERIC BARKER, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0829

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

BARKER AN INDIVIDUAL ERIC

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RUSSUM AN INDIVIDUAL TONIE

VALLEJO AN INDIVIDUAL VICTOR H.

AMERICAN BEAUTY CONDOMINIUMS I OWNERS ASSOCIATION DBA CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENBOW JILLIAN ALLYN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/25/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benbow, Jillian A