This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 04:01:49 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS ODELIA OROZCO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ODELIA OROZCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5904

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

TORRES TANIA IVONEE

OROZCO ODELIA

HERNANDEZ JULIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILLIGAN MICHAEL

DUNN NICOLE STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/20/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

1/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY ODELIA OROZCO

1/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY ODELIA OROZCO

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS]

Notice of Status Conference and Order

1/28/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/13/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

7/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/22/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/15/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Recorded Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Bankruptcy Filing by Odelia Orozco); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Recorded Notice of Pending Action [Lis Pendens]); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN NICOLE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLIGAN MICHAEL