This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 02:32:16 (UTC).

LAJOY BROWN, ET AL. VS SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 LAJOY BROWN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN NELSON and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4718

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN NELSON

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN LAJOY

MCGEE DESIREE

Defendants

SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA INC.

OSTEEN DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONES BLAKE

HAMILTON BRANDEN CAROLINE

Defendant Attorney

MCNAUGHT ANDREW MORE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 28 TO JULY 26, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA E-MAIL

6/24/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 28 TO JULY 26, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA E-MAIL

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/21/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 3/11/21 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

3/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 3/11/21 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

1/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

11/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR 12/21/20 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/21/2020: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR 12/21/20 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

9/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TIMOTHY M. HOPPE

8/27/2020: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TIMOTHY M. HOPPE

Notice of Appearance

8/27/2020: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/08/2020

7/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/08/2020

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

7/29/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/27/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

5/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (of individual claims with prejudice and class and PAGA claims without prejudice); Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Re: Plaintiffs' Request for Dismissal of Individual Claims with Prejudice and Class and PAGA Claims without Prejudice; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (of June 28 to July 26, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. via e-mail); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff); Sober Living by the Sea, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation To Continue 3/11/21 Initial Status Conference and Order; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff); Sober Living by the Sea, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Status Conference); Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff); Sober Living by the Sea, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 2:26 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 05/26/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lajoy Brown (Plaintiff); Desiree McGee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMILTON BRANDEN CAROLINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES BLAKE RICHARD