Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2020 at 00:46:58 (UTC).

LAILANI BOSTON VS GINGER DERENCIN

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 LAILANI BOSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GINGER DERENCIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6094

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSTON LAILANI

Claimant

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DERENCIN GINGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTIN MICHAEL THOMAS

MARTIN MICHAEL T.

Claimant Attorney

KOLETSKY ESQ. ROY A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...)

Order - Dismissal

12/1/2020: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...) OF 12/01/2020

12/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...) OF 12/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Lien - Notice of First Lien Rights of Employer; Request for Service; Notice of Credit Rights

12/31/2018: Notice of Lien - Notice of First Lien Rights of Employer; Request for Service; Notice of Credit Rights

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to serve / alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alte...) of 12/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alte...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:52 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of First Lien Rights of Employer; Request for Service; Notice of Credit Rights; Filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lailani Boston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lailani Boston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLETSKY ROY AARON