This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 12:04:01 (UTC).

LADAN TAHMASIAN VS ANTONIA MATTIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 LADAN TAHMASIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTONIA MATTIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDY RHODES, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7261

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDY RHODES

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAHMASIAN LADAN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MATTIA ANTONIA

LENTON PROPERTIES INC.

THE NASA GROUP LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASSMAN ROBERT S.

WERKSMAN NATHAN EMANUEL

KARIMIAN SHAHIN

Defendant Attorney

LERMAN JEFFREY EDWARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

POULL DAVID ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/6/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Judgment on Verdict in Open Court

5/11/2022: Judgment on Verdict in Open Court

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OFF CALENDAR

6/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OFF CALENDAR

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

5/24/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial

5/20/2022: Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial

Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial

5/16/2022: Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT REGARDING PLAINTIFF LADAN TAHMASIAN'S COMPARATIVE FAULT

5/2/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT REGARDING PLAINTIFF LADAN TAHMASIAN'S COMPARATIVE FAULT

Special Verdict

4/28/2022: Special Verdict

Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

4/28/2022: Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

4/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS) OF 04/28/2022

4/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS) OF 04/28/2022

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

4/28/2022: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #3

4/28/2022: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #3

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #2

4/28/2022: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #2

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #1

4/28/2022: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION #1

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff); As to: Antonia Mattia (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Antonia Mattia (Defendant) to Antonia Mattia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/06/2022 ; Status Date changed from 05/11/2022 to 07/06/2022 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/06/2022 ; Status Date changed from 07/06/2022 to 07/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for New Trial scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Antonia Mattia (Defendant); Total Costs: 33312.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for New Trial scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christopher K. Lui in Department 4A Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff); As to: Antonia Mattia (Defendant); Shirin Akhtarzad (Defendant); Sam Delijani (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff); As to: Antonia Mattia (Defendant); Shirin Akhtarzad (Defendant); Sam Delijani (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff); As to: Antonia Mattia (Defendant); Shirin Akhtarzad (Defendant); Sam Delijani (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less