This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:53:33 (UTC).

LADAN TAHMASIAN VS ANTONIA MATTIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 LADAN TAHMASIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTONIA MATTIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7261

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAHMASIAN LADAN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MATTIA ANTONIA

LENTON PROPERTIES INC.

THE NASA GROUP LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASSMAN ROBERT S.

WERKSMAN NATHAN EMANUEL

KARIMIAN SHAHIN

Defendant Attorney

LERMAN JEFFREY EDWARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CANNON ANTHONY L.

 

Court Documents

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL

11/24/2021: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES FROM TESTIFYING TO OPINIONS NOT EXPRESSED DURING THEIR DEPOSITION OR OPINIONS FOR MATTERS OUTSIDE THEIR D

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES FROM TESTIFYING TO OPINIONS NOT EXPRESSED DURING THEIR DEPOSITION OR OPINIONS FOR MATTERS OUTSIDE THEIR D

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 2 FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING PLAINTIFF FROM USING ANY "GOLDEN RULE" ARGUMENTS OR APPEALS

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 2 FOR AN ORDER PROHIBITING PLAINTIFF FROM USING ANY "GOLDEN RULE" ARGUMENTS OR APPEALS

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT ANTONIA MATTIA'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 4 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS THAT ARE INCONSISTENT WITH THE HOLDINGS OF HANIF,

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT ANTONIA MATTIA'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 4 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS THAT ARE INCONSISTENT WITH THE HOLDINGS OF HANIF,

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS, REPORTS AND BILLS BASED ON INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY;

11/29/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS, REPORTS AND BILLS BASED ON INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY;

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNI NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE APRIL I, 2021 BILL FROM DR. JALIL RASHTI

11/29/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNI NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE APRIL I, 2021 BILL FROM DR. JALIL RASHTI

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE MICHAEL HOLLANDER

11/29/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE MICHAEL HOLLANDER

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SEVEN TO EXCLUDE APRIL I, 2021 BILL FROM JAMES J. REID, M.D. INC.

11/29/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SEVEN TO EXCLUDE APRIL I, 2021 BILL FROM JAMES J. REID, M.D. INC.

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE APRIL 1, 2021 BILL FROM CULVER CITY SURGICAL SPECIALISTS

11/29/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE APRIL 1, 2021 BILL FROM CULVER CITY SURGICAL SPECIALISTS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR WITNESS NOT IDENTIFIED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR WITNESS NOT IDENTIFIED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS, REPORTS AND BILLS BASED ON INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY;

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL RECORDS, REPORTS AND BILLS BASED ON INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY;

Statement of the Case - JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

11/30/2021: Statement of the Case - JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

11/30/2021: Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Trial Brief

11/30/2021: Trial Brief

Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST

11/30/2021: Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND/OR VIDEO RECORDING DEPOSITION IN EVIDENCE AT TIME OF TRIAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 2025.340(M)

11/30/2021: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND/OR VIDEO RECORDING DEPOSITION IN EVIDENCE AT TIME OF TRIAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 2025.340(M)

Jury Instructions

11/30/2021: Jury Instructions

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR WITNESS NOT IDENTIFIED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY

12/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR WITNESS NOT IDENTIFIED OR PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF JAMES REID, M.D; Filed by Antonia Mattia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketObjection (DEFENDANT ANTONIA MATTIA'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND OR VIDEO RECORDING DEPOSITION IN EVIDENCE AT TIME OF TRIAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 2035.340(M)); Filed by Antonia Mattia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES FROM TESTIFYING TO OPINIONS NOT EXPRESSED DURING THEIR DEPOSITION OR OPINIONS FOR MATTERS OUTSIDE THEIR DESIGNATIONS); Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint); Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff); Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ladan Tahmasian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NASA GROUP LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LENTON PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERKSMAN NATHAN EMANUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSMAN ROBERT SAMUEL ESQ.