This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 03:04:41 (UTC).

LADAN SEFAT VS CBMGC, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 LADAN SEFAT filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CBMGC, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0202

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEFAT LADAN

Defendants

CBMGC A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

MOJALLAL BAHMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MISKABI JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

KUNSTLER PETER

BERKE DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

7/31/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

8/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/16/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/6/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by CBMGC, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Bahman Mojallal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CBMGC, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Bahman Mojallal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CBMGC, a business entity form unknown (Defendant); Bahman Mojallal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ladan Sefat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUNSTLER PETER M.