Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2020 at 10:01:52 (UTC).

LADAN KAGHAZI, ET AL. VS VIVIAN ULLMAN

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 LADAN KAGHAZI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIVIAN ULLMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2595

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAGHAZI LADAN

ESMAILI MEHRDAD

Defendants

ULLMAN VIVIAN

ULLMAN ELIOT AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD AND VIVIAN ULLMAN FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAKHGELDYAN VAHE

Defendant Attorney

KALTENBACH JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/23/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/18/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/18/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/18/2019: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/23/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/23/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/21/2019: PI General Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

3/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

2/13/2019: Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

2/20/2019: Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/25/2019: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Eliot Ullman, as Trustee of the HAROLD AND VIVIAN ULLMAN FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Eliot Ullman, as Trustee of the HAROLD AND VIVIAN ULLMAN FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Eliot Ullman, as Trustee of the HAROLD AND VIVIAN ULLMAN FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Eliot Ullman, as Trustee of the HAROLD AND VIVIAN ULLMAN FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ladan Kaghazi (Plaintiff); Mehrdad Esmaili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALTENBACH JOHN J. ESQ.