Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 12:33:33 (UTC).

LACHELL SHAVON JONES VS BRIAN OLIVER THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 LACHELL SHAVON JONES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN OLIVER THOMPSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1281

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES LACHELL SHAVON

Defendant

THOMPSON BRIAN OLIVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK MITCHELL P.

Defendant Attorney

VARDANYAN GEVORG S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/14/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Demand for Jury Trial

7/15/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/15/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/10/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Brian Oliver Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Brian Oliver Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Oliver Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lachell Shavon Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lachell Shavon Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lachell Shavon Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lachell Shavon Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less