This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2021 at 16:45:27 (UTC).

LABORWOSKI, CHINAZA VS SHULI, VIVIAN JIANG

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 LABORWOSKI, CHINAZA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against SHULI, VIVIAN JIANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0500

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LABORWOSKI CHINAZA

Respondent

SHULI VIVIAN JIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/30/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/19/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

7/19/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/19/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

6/7/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6/7/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

6/7/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/7/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/9/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

6/16/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Substitution of Attorney

6/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/16/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

6/24/2021: Minute Order

Response - Civil Harassment

6/24/2021: Response - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - Mail

6/25/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Proof of Service - CH-116

6/29/2021: Proof of Service - CH-116

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department S; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketRequest - Mod/Term a Restraining Order (Form 600) (No CH130 issued, filing accepted as a request to terminate a temporary restraining order. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison