This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 07:02:31 (UTC).

LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC VS KAPITZKY, FLOR

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against KAPITZKY, FLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOXER, DOREEN B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4794

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOXER, DOREEN B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LA PARK LA BREA A LLC

Respondent

KAPITZKY FLOR

Other

JURADO YESENIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/28/2021: Minute Order

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

9/30/2021: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/30/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/7/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

9/7/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/7/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 25, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA PARK LA BREA A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO