This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 13:01:16 (UTC).

LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC VS JESSICA CASEY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JESSICA CASEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1452

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA PARK LA BREA A LLC

Defendant

CASEY JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/13/2022: Complaint

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

1/13/2022: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

1/13/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

1/14/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/14/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JESSICA CASEY)

1/14/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JESSICA CASEY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE); CASE MAN...)

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE); CASE MAN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE))

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((Unlawful Detainer Case)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (Unlawful Detainer Case); Case Man...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((Unlawful Detainer Case)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (Unlawful Detainer Case))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Jessica Casey)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA PARK LA BREA A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO