This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:02:06 (UTC).

LA COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY VS NEW PACIFIC CANON LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 LA COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against NEW PACIFIC CANON LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4894

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANS-

L. A. COUNTY METRO. TRANS. AUTHORITY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

NEW PACIFIC CANON LLC

NEW PACIFIC REALTY CORPORATION

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING IN INTEREST

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CRUZ ROSA LINDA

DEMETRIOU DEL GUERCIO ET AL. LLP

MARY C. WICKHAM COUNTY COUNSEL

WICKHAM MARY CONWAY

SPRINGER JEFFREY Z.B.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HILL FARRER & BURRILL

BROGAN KEVIN H

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF ORDER FOR POSSESSION

2/23/2018: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF ORDER FOR POSSESSION

SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY (CODE CIV. PROC. ? 1255.410)

4/24/2018: SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY (CODE CIV. PROC. ? 1255.410)

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Offer to Compromise

3/1/2019: Offer to Compromise

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/7/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Exhibit List

4/3/2019: Exhibit List

Notice

5/9/2019: Notice

Declaration

5/16/2019: Declaration

Opposition

5/20/2019: Opposition

Request for Refund / Order

5/21/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order

5/22/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

5/23/2019: Notice

Opposition

5/29/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

6/3/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

7/31/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON

8/14/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 24; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 24; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Rulings on Plaintiff and Defendants' Motions in Limine; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Selling Price of 9200 Wilshire Boulevard); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice (New Pacific's Comments to Proposed Statement of Decision on Legal Issue Trial re Entitlement to Precondemnation Damages); Filed by New Pacific Canon, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION; DECLARATIONS OF BENJAMIN V. BALOS AND STEVEN M. HJELMSTROM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF RECORDATION OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ ROSA LINDA