This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 21:42:48 (UTC).

L.A. CLOSEOUT, INC., D/B/A GAMETRONICS, INC., ET AL. VS EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 L A CLOSEOUT, INC , D/B/A GAMETRONICS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0377

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

L.A CLOSEOUT INC. DBA GAMETRONICS INC.

L.A. CLOSEOUT INC.

JAVAHERIPOUR RAMIN AKA RAMIN JAVAHERY

Defendant

EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYZEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/2/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSID...)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSID...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSID...) OF 10/28/2020

10/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSID...) OF 10/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; HEARING ON MOTION FOR ...)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; HEARING ON MOTION FOR ...)

Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER THE COURT'S OCTOBER 9, 2020 ORDER

10/16/2020: Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER THE COURT'S OCTOBER 9, 2020 ORDER

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

10/16/2020: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF MANDATORY ANTI-SLAPP ATTORNEY FEES

10/16/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF MANDATORY ANTI-SLAPP ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

10/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE

10/16/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE

Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

10/16/2020: Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MISCELLANEOUS ISSUES RE MOTION...)

10/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MISCELLANEOUS ISSUES RE MOTION...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE

10/9/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION TO STRIKE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MISCELLANEOUS ISSUES RE MOTION...) OF 10/09/2020

10/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MISCELLANEOUS ISSUES RE MOTION...) OF 10/09/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

9/11/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Request for Judicial Notice

9/11/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAM AZIMTASH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

9/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAM AZIMTASH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

9/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AYZEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Motion for Reconsid...) of 10/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Motion for Reconsid...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Hearing on Motion for ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketReply (in Support of Motion for an Award of Mandatory Anti-SLAPP Attorney Fees); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketReply (in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for reconsideration of Court's Ruling on Defendant's Anti-Slapp Motion to Strike); Filed by L.A Closeout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketBrief (Supplemental Briefing Per the Court's October 9, 2020 Order); Filed by L.A Closeout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jack Rochel in Support of Special Motion to Strike); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSpecial Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (Amended); Filed by L.A Closeout, Inc. (Plaintiff); Ramin Javaheripour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by L.A. Closeout, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by L.A. Closeout, Inc., (Plaintiff); L.A Closeout, Inc. (Plaintiff); Ramin Javaheripour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by L.A. Closeout, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by L.A. Closeout, Inc., (Plaintiff); L.A Closeout, Inc. (Plaintiff); Ramin Javaheripour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.A. CLOSEOUT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYZEN MICHAEL