This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2021 at 14:11:12 (UTC).

LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MARILYN BLAWAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARILYN BLAWAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3984

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BLAWAS CHAD

BLAWAS MARILYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REHASTE RITA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

5/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

6/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA BREA REHABILITAION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REHASTE RITA