This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:21:15 (UTC).

LA BREA LLC VS STEVEN HARTONO

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 LA BREA LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against STEVEN HARTONO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4737

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA BREA LLC

Defendants and Respondents

CATALYST JEWELRY

HARTONO STEVEN

OCCUPANCY ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2/20/2018: SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2/20/2018: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2/28/2018: ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

3/5/2018: REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL?UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/5/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

4/2/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/6/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/16/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL

3/22/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 37; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by La Brea LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 37; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Trial Setting; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketREQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE S&C (UD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by La Brea LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

COUNTRYWIDE PROCEES, LLC.: (888 8G0~-8312Z: 02/27/18; 14:15

Attorney or Party without Attorney:

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BC694737

1. At the time of service I was at least 18 yearsparty to this action. :

TIME OF THE FILING OF THE ACTION

b. Person served: STEVEN HARTONQO DBA CATALYST JEWELRY - NAMED TENANT 4. Address where the party was served. 620 1/2 S. LA BREA AVE.

. LOS ANGELES, CA 90036 5. Iserved the party: d. by other means On: Fri., Feb. 23, 2018 at: 11:26AM By Posting and First Class Mail in Accordance with CCP 415.46, and by leaving the copies with or in the Presence of:

| STEVEN HARTONO DBA CATALYST JEWELRY - NAMED TENANT

(1) (Business) By posting & mailing

(4) I thereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the documents to the person to be served at the place where the copies were left (Code Civ. Proc., 415.20). I mailed the document on: Fri., Feb. 23, 2018 from: LOS ANGELES, CA

6. The "Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons) was completed as follows: on behalf of: ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF THE FILING OF THE Other: ACTION CCP 415.46 - OCCUPANT

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1500-04 LA Brea, LLC is a litigant