This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 05:19:18 (UTC).

LA BELLE MONIQUE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION VS WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 LA BELLE MONIQUE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1187

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA BELLE MONIQUE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC.

WANKE INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBO DAVID JOEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCGUIRE RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

3/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/14/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Status Conference Report

3/18/2022: Status Conference Report

Status Conference Statement

12/14/2021: Status Conference Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/15/2021

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE /PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE /PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report

11/2/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Status Report

6/23/2021: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/11/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/4/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Status Report

10/29/2020: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

7/31/2020: Status Report

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial ((3 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Jury Trial ((3 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by La Belle Monique Homeowner's Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WANKE INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBO DAVID JOEL