This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 21:59:51 (UTC).

L TECH NETWORK SERVICES, INC. VS ADLI LAW GROUP, PC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 L TECH NETWORK SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADLI LAW GROUP, PC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7273

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L TECH NETWORK SERVICES INC.

Defendant

ADLI LAW GROUP PC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW RON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by L TECH NETWORK SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by L TECH NETWORK SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by L TECH NETWORK SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADLI LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON