This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 13:49:36 (UTC).

KYUNG-JAE MOON VS MARK LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 KYUNG-JAE MOON filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARK LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1028

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOON KYUNG-JAE DBA WOODLAND TEXTBOOKS

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

LAWRENCE MARK DBA TROPHYMAN

LAWRENCE MARK

Not Classified By Court

MOON KYUNG-JAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE EDWIN KUN

PARK KEVIN H.

Defendant Attorneys

ANVARI ERIC ERIC

ANVARI SEPENTA ERIC

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LEE EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ON PARTIES STIPULATION

11/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ON PARTIES STIPULATION

Order - ORDER ORDER ON PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND CONTINUE TRIAL

11/7/2022: Order - ORDER ORDER ON PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATE CASES)

11/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATE CASES)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER AND PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

11/7/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER AND PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATE CASES) OF 11/07/2022

11/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATE CASES) OF 11/07/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TO OPEN...)

10/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TO OPEN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

10/19/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED CASES FOR TRIAL AND PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES) OF 07/13/2022

7/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASES) OF 07/13/2022

Notice of Related Case

7/12/2022: Notice of Related Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/8/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

9/2/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

7/14/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2024
  • Hearing05/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • Hearing09/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Order on Parties Stipulation); Filed by MARK LAWRENCE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Docketat 3:12 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder (Order on Parties' Stipulation to Consolidate the Related Cases for Trial and Continue Trial); Filed by Mark Lawrence (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Consolidate Related Cases for Trial and Continue Trial in Order and Participate in Mediation); Filed by Mark Lawrence (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Consolidate Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Consolidate Cases) of 11/07/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mark Lawrence (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kyung-Jae Moon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truck Insurance Exchange is a litigant