This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 15:25:14 (UTC).

KYNAN BRUCE VS CALIFORNIA CARE, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 KYNAN BRUCE filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0884

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUCE KYNAN

Defendants

CALIFORNIA CARE INC

MELKUMYAN EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2022

6/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2022

6/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/30/2022

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Related Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docketat 4:31 PM in Department 40, David Sotelo, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 06/30/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (notice of remote appearance); Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kynan Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL