This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 08:32:29 (UTC).

KYM WHITLEY VS SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 KYM WHITLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3548

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITLEY KYM

Defendant

SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC. DBA GREEN THUMB NURSERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLAS CARL EDWIN

MCLEAN TIFFANY ANDREA

Defendant Attorney

JONES DAVID L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/10/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

10/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer - DEFENDANT SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. DBA GREEN THUMB NURSERY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. DBA GREEN THUMB NURSERY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2024
  • Hearing09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Kym Whitley (Plaintiff): First Name changed from KYM to Kym; Last Name changed from WHITLEY to Whitley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Super Garden Centers, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. to Super Garden Centers, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant Super Garden Centers, Inc. DBA Green Thumb Nursery's Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Super Garden Centers, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KYM WHITLEY (Plaintiff); As to: SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/18/2021; Service Cost: 89.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KYM WHITLEY (Plaintiff); As to: SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KYM WHITLEY (Plaintiff); As to: SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KYM WHITLEY (Plaintiff); As to: SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KYM WHITLEY (Plaintiff); As to: SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLEAN TIFFANY ANDREA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLAS CARL EDWIN