This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2022 at 15:26:55 (UTC).

KYLE WEBB ET AL VS ROBERTOS AUTO SALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 KYLE WEBB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERTOS AUTO SALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE B. O'DONNELL and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6285

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE B. O'DONNELL

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEBB KYLE

SAUNDERS MICHELLE

Defendants

ROBERTO'S AUTO SALES 2

USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

JOSE CAMPOS DBA ROBERTO AUTO SALES

CAMPOS DOE 4 JOSE M.

CAMPOS DOE 2 HERBERTH E.

CAMPOS DOE 1 GILBERTO E.

CAMPOS DOE 3 ARTURO R

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendants

CAMPOS HERBERTH E.

CAMPOS ARTURO E.

CAMPOS GILBERTO E.

CAMPOS JOSE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY CHRISTOPHER PATRICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAIL MAUREEN MIRA

FALLAT JOHN LYSTER ESQ.

TOMLIN TIMOTHY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/28/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/19/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN UNSATISFIED WRIT - NO WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RECEIVED .

10/11/2022: Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN UNSATISFIED WRIT - NO WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RECEIVED .

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/2/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

7/21/2022: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KLITZKE IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION

7/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KLITZKE IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/19/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

6/27/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

6/30/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/1/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/7/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/12/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/14/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

10/7/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TSOLIK KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

10/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TSOLIK KAZANDJIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KLITZKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

10/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KLITZKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/22/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

10/22/2021: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return (Unsatisfied Writ - No Writ Of Attachment Received .); Filed by Michelle Saunders (Plaintiff); Kyle Webb (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Great American Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles )); Filed by Michelle Saunders (Plaintiff); Kyle Webb (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KLITZKE IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION); Filed by Michelle Saunders (Plaintiff); Kyle Webb (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
378 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Kyle Webb (Plaintiff); Michelle Saunders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kyle Webb (Plaintiff); Michelle Saunders (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PMIIIVC DAMAGES [CODE OF CM PROCEDURE 425.115]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF VENUE OF PLAINTIFF KYLE WEBB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF VENUE OF PLAINTIFF MICHELLE SAUNDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6285 Hearing Date: April 28, 2022 Dept: 74

****6285 KYLE WEBB VS ROBERTOS AUTO SALES

Plaintiff’s Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED IN PART.

Lodestar is $140,535 for 323.1 hours worked. The law presumes and the court finds the time spent and claimed hourly rates are reasonable.

Plaintiff’s request for a multiplier is DENIED. This case brought pursuant to the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act presented the same issues raised in most Song-Beverly cases. There was nothing particularly novel or difficult about this case separating it from other cases brought pursuant to the Act. The court has considered the novelty and difficulty of the questions involved; the skill displayed in presenting them; the extent to which the nature of the litigation precluded other employment by the attorneys; the contingent nature of the fee award; and the success achieved. The court has also considered counsel’s skill, experience, and hourly rate in determining lodestar. And while counsel ably litigated this case, the quality of representation did not far exceed the quality of representation that would have been provided by an attorney of comparable skill and experience billing at the hourly rates used in the lodestar calculation.

Plaintiff is awarded fees in the amount of $140,535.



Case Number: ****6285    Hearing Date: October 27, 2020    Dept: 74

****6285 KYLE WEBB vs ROBERTOS AUTO SALES

Defense Counsel Cyrus S. Tabibnia’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. Moving party to give notice.



Case Number: ****6285    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 74

****6285 KYLE WEBB ET AL VS ROBERTOS AUTO SALES ET AL

Defense Counsel’s Unopposed Motion to Relieved as Counsel of Record

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. The court sets an OSC re striking the answer for failure obtain counsel for March 3, 2020 at 8:30. Moving party to give notice.



Case Number: ****6285    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 74

****6285 KYLE WEBB VS ROBERTOS AUTO SALES

Great American Insurance Company’s Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted. Trial on the cross complaint is continued to August 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The FSC for the trial on the cross complaint is continued to August 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Moving party to give notice.



Case Number: ****6285    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 74

****6285 KYLE WEBB ET AL VS ROBERTOS AUTO SALES ET AL

Defendant Roberto’s Auto Sales 2’s attorney Cyrus S. Tabibnia, Tabibnia Law Firm’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

TENTATIVE RULING: The hearing is continued to February 4, 2020. Mr. Tabibnia may file a supplemental declaration five court days before the hearing. Moving party to give notice.

Counsel has emailed the motion and other motions, and has sent five emails to client. He has also called the telephone number for the client and served the motion at the last known address. This does not confirm the client is still located at that address, email address, and telephone number. The client is a business, and counsel can confirm whether the business remains operational and whether his contact, Mr. Campos, remains at the business. There has been no confirmation that the last known address is still correct. If the business is closed, a request for a forwarding address should be requested.

The hearing is continued for counsel to make additional efforts to locate the client.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tomlin, Timothy J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALLAT JOHN L.