This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 11:19:11 (UTC).

KYLE FERGUSON VS VOLKSWAGENS GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 KYLE FERGUSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGENS GROUP OF AMERICA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1661

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON KYLE

Defendants

LITHIA AUDI VAN NUYS

VOLKSWAGENS GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA G.

Defendant Attorneys

TALLENT ERIN E

LEACH BRIAN E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/28/2022: Answer

Answer

12/6/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SHERMAN OAKS-A, INC. d/b/a AUDI VAN NUYS Erroneously Sued As Lithia Audi Van Nuys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagens Group Of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff); As to: Lithia Audi Van Nuys (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2022; Service Cost: 78.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagens Group Of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/25/2022; Service Cost: 43.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagens Group Of America, Inc. (Defendant); Lithia Audi Van Nuys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagens Group Of America, Inc. (Defendant); Lithia Audi Van Nuys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kyle Ferguson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagens Group Of America, Inc. (Defendant); Lithia Audi Van Nuys (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TALLENT ERIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEACH BRIAN E