This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 20:26:12 (UTC).

KWON'S INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP VS BEHNAM SAGHIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 KWON'S INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BEHNAM SAGHIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4318

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KWON'S INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

SAGHIAN BEHNAM DBA MODERN BRIDE

YERUSHAIMI PARIZ DBA MODERN BRIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANT MARK ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BEHNAM SAGHIAN)

12/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BEHNAM SAGHIAN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (PARIZ YERUSHAIMI)

12/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (PARIZ YERUSHAIMI)

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

12/6/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

12/6/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/6/2021: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kwon's Investment Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((BEHNAM SAGHIAN)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((PARIZ YERUSHAIMI)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Kwon's Investment Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kwon's Investment Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kwon's Investment Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONSTANT MARK ROBERT