This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:54:28 (UTC).

KWANG T. KUO VS DELTA DAWGS CONSTRUCTION CORP

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 KWANG T KUO filed an Other lawsuit against DELTA DAWGS CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OKI, DAN THOMAS, DAN THOMAS OKI and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1450

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OKI, DAN THOMAS

DAN THOMAS OKI

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUO KWANG T.

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DELTA DAWGS CONSTRUCTION CORP

TILE KING GROUP USA INC

SERVPRO ROSEMEAD

EXPRESS RESTORATION COMPANY

ROSEMEAD SERVPRO

DELTA DAWGS CONSTRUCTION CORP. DBA SERVPRO ROSEMEAD DBA EXPRESS RESTORATION COMPANY

TILE KING GROUP USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ONUNKWO CECILIA I. ESQ.

ONUNKWO CECILIA IFY

Defendant Attorney

WONG LIBBY

 

Court Documents

Other -

8/21/2018: Other -

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

3/11/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition

3/11/2019: Opposition

Notice

3/12/2019: Notice

Reply

3/14/2019: Reply

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/22/2019: Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/17/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

10/2/2018: Minute Order

Motion for Attorney Fees

1/2/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Minute Order

10/17/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

10/5/2018: Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/17/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment

8/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Notice

8/23/2018: Notice

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Kwang T. Kuo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Order (Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs); Filed by Kwang T. Kuo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice (Notice Of Errata RE Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 8488); Filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corp. (Defendant); SERVPRO ROSEMEAD (Legacy Party); EXPRESS RESTORATION COMPANY (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Opposition (Defendants Delta Dawgs et al. Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney's fees and Costs Pursuant To Cal. Civ. Code #8488; Memorandum of Points and Authorities); Filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corp. (Defendant); SERVPRO ROSEMEAD (Legacy Party); EXPRESS RESTORATION COMPANY (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Kwang T. Kuo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • PETITION FOR RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Express Restoration Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DELTA DAWGS CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG LIBBY