Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 18:45:41 (UTC).

KUSH BHARDWAY, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MONICA BHARDWAJ VS LANETTE ADEANE HATCH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 KUSH BHARDWAY, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MONICA BHARDWAJ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANETTE ADEANE HATCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1500

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

HATCH LANETTE ADEANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KUSH

4/15/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KUSH

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/9/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/5/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KUSH

4/5/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KUSH

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kush); Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kush); Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kush Bhardway, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Monica Bhardwaj (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.