Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:36:27 (UTC).

KURT STROMER, ERVIN STROMER VS. FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 KURT STROMER, ERVIN STROMER filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON and MICHAEL J. CONVEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7328

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STROMER ERVIN

STROMER KURT

Defendants

FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING

DOES 1-20

HSBC BAN USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TER-SAAKYAN JACK

TER-SAAKYAN AKOP JACK

Attorney at JT Legal Group, APC

801 N Brand Blvd Suite 1130

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

STARRETT AMY E. ESQ.

TRAN BRIAN H.

REEVES DEAN ALLEN

TRAN BRIAN HUY

STARRETT AMY ELIZABETH ESQ.

CLOUD W. DEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/31/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

6/4/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/15/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Order - Dismissal

11/20/2018: Order - Dismissal

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/27/2018: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Legacy Document

8/8/2018: Legacy Document

Declaration

10/24/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

12/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/14/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/2/2018: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

10/15/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

9/17/2018: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

9/17/2018: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

9/17/2018: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

9/17/2018: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

9/17/2018: Notice of Continuance

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by First American Trustee Servicing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff); Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (for Plaintiffs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Objection; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff); Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Disclaimer; Filed by First American Trustee Servicing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Disclaimer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff); Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff); Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff); Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff); Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Kurt Stromer (Plaintiff); Ervin Stromer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLU- is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant