This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 13:44:19 (UTC).

KURT SPROUL VS ALISSA GAIL MYER ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2017 KURT SPROUL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALISSA GAIL MYER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3047

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SPROUL KURT

Respondents and Defendants

MYER ALISSA GAIL

DOES 1 TO 100

MYER BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

B & D LAW GROUP APLC

FARID MAHSA

GILERMAN GABRIELLE RACHEL

Defendant Attorney

SHRAIBATI MALEK HAMED

 

Court Documents

Other -

10/4/2018: Other -

Motion to Quash

10/4/2018: Motion to Quash

Motion to Quash

10/4/2018: Motion to Quash

Other -

10/4/2018: Other -

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Opposition

11/26/2018: Opposition

Opposition

11/28/2018: Opposition

Reply

12/4/2018: Reply

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/10/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Order

12/12/2018: Order

Unknown

12/12/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

1/11/2019: Opposition

Request for Judicial Notice

3/4/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel

3/4/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

3/4/2019: Motion to Compel

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF LEAD HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Demand for Production) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) ((further trial continuances by Motion or Stipulation)); Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES); Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) PURSUANT TO C.C.P 2025,220; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR REASONABLE SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS? FEES; DE); Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF?S FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR REASONABLE SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS? FEES; DECLARATION OF VANESSA A. HUEY; [PROPOSED); Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alissa Gail Myer (Defendant); Barbara Myer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kurt Sproul (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3047    Hearing Date: February 20, 2020    Dept: 29

Sproul v. Myer et al.

Plaintiff’s four motions to compel Defendants Alissa Gail Myer and Barbara Myer to Respond to Request for Supplemental Interrogatories, Set Two and Demand for Production of Documents, Set Two, and for sanctions filed on 01/14/20 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motions to compel responses are DENIED as moot MOOT. Defendants served responses to the discovery at issue after the motion was filed.

The motions are GRANTED with respect to the requests for sanctions. The Court imposes sanctions in the total sum of $1000 against Defendants’ counsel of record, Adam Wright, Esq. and Veatch Carlson, LLP for failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery, which constitutes discovery abuse, and whose conduct necessitated motion practice. (Code Civ. Proc. ;2023.010(a)(4); ; 2033.280(c).) The Court declines to impose sanctions against Defendants because defense counsel presented evidence that the failure to respond was due to counsel’s mistakes and not the conduct of Defendants.

Moving parties are ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHRAIBATI MALEK H