This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 01:33:11 (UTC).

KURT MOEDER ET AL VS KEVIN LENTON ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 KURT MOEDER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KEVIN LENTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3272

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MOEDER KURT

MOEDER NICOLE

Defendants and Respondents

LENTON LINDA

DOES 1 TO 20

LENTON KEVIN

DEL AMO HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WOODLAND WILLIAM O.

SULLIVAN JEROLD

WOODLAND WILLIAM OWENS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAFER MARC S. ESQ.

LAFER MARC STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

12/11/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/11/2019: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

11/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA

11/5/2019: Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA

Notice - NOTICE UPDATED PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION

10/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE UPDATED PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING COMPL...)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING COMPL...)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE OF DEL AMO HOSPITAL TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

8/30/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE OF DEL AMO HOSPITAL TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

Substitution of Attorney

9/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Association of Attorney

4/16/2019: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/30/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS KEVIN LENTON AND LINDA LENTON;DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

4/2/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS KEVIN LENTON AND LINDA LENTON;DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/7/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

2/7/2018: SUMMONS -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Hearing03/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial ((1st)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:34 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (proposed order and stipulation to continue trial); Filed by Kurt Moeder (Plaintiff); Nicole Moeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Kevin Lenton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Kevin Lenton (Defendant); Linda Lenton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS KEVIN LENTON AND LINDA LENTON;DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kevin Lenton (Defendant); Linda Lenton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kurt Moeder (Plaintiff); Nicole Moeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693272    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

KURD MOEDER, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

KEVIN LENTON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC693272

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 18, 2019

Defendants propounded a deposition subpoena on Del Amo Hospital. At this time, Defendants move to compel compliance with the subpoena. The Court previously denied Defendant’s motion to compel compliance with the subpoena on the ground that Defendants failed to file proof of service of the moving papers on the Hospital, as required by CRC 3.1346.

Defendants have now served the moving papers on the Hospital (and also on Plaintiffs). No party opposes the motion; indeed, the Hospital indicates it is willing to produce the records, but needs a court order or Plaintiff’s authorization to do so. In the absence of opposition, the motion is granted. CCP §1987.1.

The Hospital is ordered to produce all records subject to the subpoena on 11/27/19 at 10:00 a.m. at the Law Office of Michael Maguire & Associates, 611 Anton Blvd., Suite 900, Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1904; the Hospital may also mail all responsive records to this address prior to 11/27/19.

The Court notes that sanctions are not at issue on this motion, and none are imposed.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.