This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 12:39:55 (UTC).

KUROSH N. CHAMAN VS CITY OF HOPE MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 KUROSH N CHAMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CITY OF HOPE MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9506

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMAN KUROSH N.

Defendants

PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHAN KEVIN M.D.

SATTERTHWAITE ROGER W. M.D.

CHEN JACK M.D.

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WARNER JONATHAN N. M.D.

CITY OF HOPE MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JALILVAND KAMELIA

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN BRIAN

CHORTANIAN JAMES A.

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

4/25/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

5/3/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund / Order

7/27/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/15/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 27; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kurosh N. Chaman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less