This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2022 at 19:32:17 (UTC).

KUN YEN VS MIGUEL VELEZ, M.D., , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 KUN YEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MIGUEL VELEZ, M D , ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7011

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEN KUN

Defendants

PIH HEALTH WHITTIER HOSPITAL

VELEZ M.D. MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS STEVEN D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL RICHARD

DOBSON MITZIE L

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/25/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

5/11/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

5/10/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/10/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

5/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/12/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2025
  • Hearing02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/08/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: PIH Health Whittier Hospital (Defendant); As to: Kun Yen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PIH Health Whittier Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant); As to: Kun Yen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION RE TRIAL ATTORNEY; Filed by: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kun Yen (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant); Service Date: 04/11/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kun Yen (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant); PIH Health Whittier Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kun Yen (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Velez, M.D., (Defendant); PIH Health Whittier Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less