This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 19:52:34 (UTC).

KUMAR, VARUN VS SHARMA, SHAVETA

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 KUMAR, VARUN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHARMA, SHAVETA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0865

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KUMAR VARUN

Respondent

SHARMA SHAVETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

6/13/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

Summons - Summons (Summons)

6/13/2022: Summons - Summons (Summons)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

6/13/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

7/11/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE