Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 14:19:07 (UTC).

KRYSTAL WILSON, ET AL. VS DEREK FRANK WILLIAMS, MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 KRYSTAL WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEREK FRANK WILLIAMS, MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9375

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON KIMMIE

ABUBATA BENNETT

WILSON KRYSTAL

Defendants

ELLEDGE KAY MD

WILLIAMS DEREK FRANK MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVACK BARRY BERNARD

Defendant Attorneys

LAW YUK K.

DATOMI CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS 399

11/10/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS 399

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/10/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/18/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFE...)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFE...)

Demand for Jury Trial

7/29/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT KAY ELLEDGE, M.D.S REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 3.254 CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT

7/30/2020: Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT KAY ELLEDGE, M.D.S REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 3.254 CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY, PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATIONS STANDARDS

7/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY, PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATIONS STANDARDS

Answer

7/30/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/30/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM KIMMIE

6/15/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM KIMMIE

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Discovery) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Informal Discovery Confe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Kay Elledge, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (399); Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Kay Elledge, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Derek Frank Williams, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Derek Frank Williams, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Kimmie); Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Krystal Wilson (Plaintiff); Bennett Abubata (Plaintiff); Kimmie Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVACK BARRY BERNARD