This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 09:20:54 (UTC).

KRYSTAL SANCHEZ VS MARIA M RAMIREZ REYES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 KRYSTAL SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARIA M RAMIREZ REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9494

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SANCHEZ KRYSTAL

Respondents and Defendants

LAS DELICIAS DE PUEBLA

DOES 1 TO 40

REYES MARIA M. RAMIREZ

BANETASCRUZ MARCOS

VANEGASCRUZ MARCO ANTONIO

VANEGASCRUZ MARCO

PUEBLA LAS DELICIAS DE

REYES MARIA M. RAMIREZ DBA LAS DELICIAS DE PUEBLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF WALTER F. WIGGINS JR.

WIGGINS WALTER FRANKLIN JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ACTION AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION

3/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ACTION AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. BUCK IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 5, 2022

12/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN M. BUCK IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 5, 2022

Notice of Settlement

12/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

12/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, MARIA M. RAMIREZ REYES, TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

12/21/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, MARIA M. RAMIREZ REYES, TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

12/30/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

12/30/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/2/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Dismissal of Action and Retention of Jurisdiction); Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against counsel for plaintiff and counsel for defendant for failure to comply with the court's order refiling notice of settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions against counsel for defendant for failure to appear) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause for Failure to Appear); Filed by Maria M. Ramirez Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNLAWFUL HARASSMENT BASED ON SCX (CAL. GOV CODE 12940(J)); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KRYSTAL SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9494    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

krystal sanchez,

Plaintiff,

v.

Maria M. Ramirez Reyes, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****9494

Hearing Date: January 5, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel discovery responses

Plaintiff Krystal Sanchez (“Plaintiff”) moves to compel responses from Defendants Maria Ramirez Reyes and Las Delicias De Puebla (“Defendants”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One and Form Interrogatories (Employment), Set One (“FROGs”); and (3) Requests for Admissions, Set One (“RFAs”).

Plaintiff electronically served the written discovery on Defendants on May 4, 2020. Plaintiff offered Defendants extensions of time to respond through October 15, 2020. After Plaintiff filed these motions, Defendant’s counsel filed a declaration stating that Defendant has served verified responses, without objections. Therefore, the motion is denied as moot except with respect to sanctions.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions in connection with the motion. The Court concludes that Defendants’ failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. Indeed, the discovery was served on May 4, 2020, and the responses were not served for approximately seven months. The Court has considered Defendant’s counsel’s declaration and finds good cause not to sanction counsel, but the declaration provides no excuse for his client’s excessive delays. Therefore, the Court orders Defendants, but not Defendant’s counsel, to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,060, based upon four hours of attorney time at $250 per hour plus one filing fee of $60.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motion is denied as moot except with respect to sanctions. The Court orders Defendants to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,060 within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 5, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID