This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 17:25:50 (UTC).

KRYSTAL MEDINA VS LEGACY PARTNERS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 KRYSTAL MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEGACY PARTNERS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0058

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA KRYSTAL

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

LEGACY PARTNERS LLC

THE VERANDAS APARTMENTS

LIBERTY LANDSCAPING INC.

SHORELINE LANDCARE INC. DBA LANDCARE LOGIC

SHORELINE LAND CARE INC. DBA LANDCARE LOGIC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

SHORELINE LAND CARE INC. DBA LANDCARE LOGIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IARUSSO MICHELLE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LARIN MICHAEL JAY

SALDANA MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/8/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/28/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/26/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/28/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/16/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

7/28/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/28/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/6/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/20/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2024
  • Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Krystal Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SHORELINE LAND CARE INC. (Defendant); As to: Krystal Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Krystal Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Shoreline LandCare, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from LandCare Logic (Cross-Defendant) to SHORELINE LAND CARE INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- SHORELINE LAND CARE INC.: Organization Name changed from LandCare Logic to SHORELINE LAND CARE INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Legacy Partners, LLC (Cross-Complainant); As to: LandCare Logic (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Krystal Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, LLC (Defendant); The Verandas Apartments (Defendant); LandCare Logic (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Krystal Medina (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, LLC (Defendant); The Verandas Apartments (Defendant); LandCare Logic (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less