This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 17:59:53 (UTC).

KRUNAL PATEL VS SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 KRUNAL PATEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6285

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL KRUNAL

Defendants

EXETER FINANCE CORP. A TEXAS CORPORATION

SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC.

GALAXY AUTO MALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSEY|SMITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT EXETER FINANCE CORP., A TEXAS CORPORATION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Default Entered (AS TO SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS, INC. ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 05/23/17 Declaration of Mailing attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 05/19/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL AKA DISCOUNT AUTO PLAZA AKA CAR LEGACY is a litigant

Latest cases where GALAXY AUTO MALL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM is a litigant

Latest cases where EXETER FINANCE LLC is a litigant