This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:29:13 (UTC).

KRISTOPHER J. FLORES VS AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 KRISTOPHER J FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3307

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES KRISTOPHER J.

Respondent

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KORFF EVE H. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

MIKHCHI REZA H.

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/3/2017: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/8/2017: RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order

9/21/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service

9/26/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

11/15/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/5/2018: Minute Order

CLAIMANT'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/5/2018: CLAIMANT'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

REPLY TO PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/14/2018: REPLY TO PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

STATEMENT OF DECISION

2/22/2018: STATEMENT OF DECISION

ORDER AFTER HEARING

2/22/2018: ORDER AFTER HEARING

Minute Order

2/22/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/13/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDED PETITION TO OPEN SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING SUPERIOR COURT JURISDICTION OVER UNDERINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATED MATTER

8/23/2017: AMENDED PETITION TO OPEN SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING SUPERIOR COURT JURISDICTION OVER UNDERINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATED MATTER

Proof of Service

8/17/2017: Proof of Service

PETITION TO OPEN SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING SUPERIOR COURT JURISDICTION OVER UNDERINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION MATTER

7/19/2017: PETITION TO OPEN SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING SUPERIOR COURT JURISDICTION OVER UNDERINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION MATTER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7/19/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by KRISTOPHER J. FLORES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by KRISTOPHER J. FLORES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Petition; Filed by KRISTOPHER J. FLORES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PETITION TO OPEN SUPERIOR COURT FILE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING SUPERIOR COURT JURISDICTION OVER UNDERINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.